EP1250195 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING INSULATIONS OF ELECTRIC CONDUCTORS BY MEANS OF POWDER COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANN, Thomas Rebbergstrasse 17 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
NIENBURG, Johann Burgstrasse 40 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
OESTERHELD, Jörg Widegass 7 CH-5413 Birmenstorf / CH | 04 /
SOPKA, Jörg Buchenweg 17a 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | [2002/43] | Application number, filing date | 00982814.6 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/43] | WO2000CH00683 | Priority number, date | DE1999163378 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19963378 | [2002/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0148763 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1250195 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1250195 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/06, B05D7/00, B05D5/12, H01B3/30, H01B3/40 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
H01B3/40 (EP,US);
H01B3/00 (KR);
H01B3/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ISOLIERUNGEN ELEKTRISCHER LEITER MITTELS PULVERBESCHICHTUNG | [2002/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING INSULATIONS OF ELECTRIC CONDUCTORS BY MEANS OF POWDER COATING | [2002/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'ISOLATIONS DE CONDUCTEURS ELECTRIQUES PAR RECOUVREMENT AVEC UNE POUDRE | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Request for further processing for: | 08.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4760296 (JOHNSTON DON R [US], et al) [AD] 10 * claim - *; | [X]US4966928 (KITAGAWA KATUGI [JP], et al) [X] 10-14,16-23 * table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [AD]DE4037972 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [AD] 10 * claim - *; | [A]US5043401 (MATSUZAKI KUNIMITSU [JP]) [A] 10 * column 3, line 52 - line 59 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE19701307 (GOTTLOB THUMM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* claim - *; | [X]DE19706851 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19817287 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1-6,8 * examples 1,4 * * claims 1,5,13,14,19 * |