EP1232257 - MODULAR TRANSPORT SYSTEMS FOR MOLECULAR SUBSTANCES AND PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACGT Progenomics AG Weinbergweg 22 06120 Halle (Saale) / DE | [2002/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖHM, Gerald Windthorststrasse 6 06114 Halle (Saale) / DE | 02 /
RUDOLPH, Rainer Dr. Hans-Litten-Strasse 28 06120 Halle (Saale) / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Ulrich 132B Cambridge St West Leederville, WA 6007 / AU | 04 /
ESSER, Dirk 4 Bridewell Rd., Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9EW / GB | [2002/37] |
Former [2002/34] | 01 /
BÖHM, Gerald Windthorststrasse 6 06114 Halle (Saale) / DE | ||
02 /
RUDOLPH, Rainer Dr. Hans-Litten-Strasse 28 06120 Halle (Saale) / DE | |||
03 /
SCHMIDT, Ulrich Charlottenstrasse 3 06108 Halle (Salle) / DE | |||
04 /
ESSER, Dirk Goethestrasse 24 06114 Halle (Saale) / DE | Representative(s) | Behnisch, Werner ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/34] | Behnisch, Werner, Dr. Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00983106.6 | 03.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000EP10876 | Priority number, date | DE1999152957 | 03.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19952957 | [2002/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0132851 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1232257 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232257 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
A61K47/6901 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/22022 (EP,US);
C12N2710/22023 (EP,US);
C12N2810/50 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 28.05.2002 | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 28.05.2002 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE TRANSPORTSYSTEME FÜR MOLEKULARE SUBSTANZEN UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2002/34] | English: | MODULAR TRANSPORT SYSTEMS FOR MOLECULAR SUBSTANCES AND PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2002/34] | French: | SYSTEMES DE TRANSPORT MODULAIRES POUR SUBSTANCES MOLECULAIRES ET FABRICATION ET UTILISATION DE CES SYSTEMES | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IE | 14.10.2009 | IT | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | AT | 03.11.2009 | LU | 03.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | FR | 14.12.2009 | GB | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | DE | 01.06.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/43] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
TR | 14.10.2009 | ||
AT | 03.11.2009 | ||
LU | 03.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 14.12.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
DE | 01.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
AT | 03.11.2009 | ||
LU | 03.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 14.12.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
DE | 01.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
AT | 03.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 14.12.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
DE | 01.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
AT | 03.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 14.12.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
DE | 01.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 14.12.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
DE | 01.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 14.12.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
DE | 01.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 14.12.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9613599 (WELS WINFRIED [DE], et al) [Y] 1-24 * examples 19,20,22,23; claims 2-4,10,12 *; | [XY]WO9743431 (BERTLING WOLF [DE]) [X] 1-5,11-13,15,18-21,24 * page 4, line 29 - line 33; examples 1-4; claims 1,3,7,13-18 * * SIEHE OBEN * [Y] 6-10,14,16,17,22,23; | [Y]US5766897 (BRAXTON SCOTT M [US]) [Y] 8-10 * "Abstract"; page 1, column 2 *; | [Y]WO9848841 (RPMS TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-24 * page 1 - page 3 *; | [XY]WO9913905 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,13,20,21,24 * page 31, line 17 - page 32, line 28; claims 1,4,5,7-10,12,17,23 * * SIEHE OBEN * [Y] 6-8,10-12,14-19,22,23; | [Y]WO9950424 (STANLEY MARGARET ANNE [GB], et al) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 * * page 2, line 12 - line 33 * * page 3, line 35 * * page 4, line 2 - line 6 *; | [PX]WO0000224 (NOVEMBER AG MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN [DE], et al) [PX] 1-5,11,13,15,18-21,24 * Seite 7, Beispiel;; claims 1,4,15,19,21,22,24,27 *; | [XY] - AN K. ET AL, "USE OF THE BACULOVIRUS SYSTEM TO ASSEMBLE POLYOMAVIRUS CAPSID-LIKE PARTICLES WITH DIFFERENT POLYOMAVIRUS STRUCTURERAL PROTEINS: ANALYSIS OF THE RECOMBINANT ASSEMBLED CAPSID-LIKE PARTICLES", J GENERAL VIROLOGY, (199904), vol. 80, pages 1009 - 1016, XP002176023 [X] 1-7,17-24 * page 1010, column 1, paragraph 1 * * DISCUSSION; page 1013, column 2 * * page 1014, column 1, paragraphs 3,4 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 1015, column 1 * * SIEHE OBEN * [Y] 8-16,22,23 | [XY] - MÜLLER M ET AL, "Chimeric papillomavirus-like particles", VIROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, US, (19970721), vol. 234, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 93 - 111, XP002091857 [X] 1-3,5,18-20 * abstract * * page 97, column 1, paragraphs 1,2,4 * * page 99; table 1 * * DISCUSSION; page 108, column 1 * * SIEHE OBEN * [Y] 4,6-17,21-24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1997.8591 | [Y] - FORSTOVA J ET AL, "POLYOMA VIRUS PSEUDOCAPSIDS AS EFFICIENT CARRIERS OF HETEROLOGOUS DNA INTO MAMMALIAN CELLS", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (19950301), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 297 - 306, XP000645479 [Y] 1-24 * page 304, column 1, line 49 - line 54 * * page 305, column 1, line 28 - line 33 * * page 305, column 1, line 37 - line 40 * * page 305, column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 1 * * page 305, column 2, line 26 - line 34 * | [Y] - TANAKA S, MIKHAILOV M, ROY P, "Synthesis of bluetongue virus chimeric VP3 molecules and their interactions with VP7 protein to assemble into virus", VIROLOGY, (19951220), vol. 214, pages 593 - 601, XP000986265 [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * page 593 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1995.0070 | [Y] - LOUDON PT, ROY P, "Interaction of nucleic acids with core-like and subcore-like particles of bluetongue virus.", VIROLOGY, (199211), vol. 191, pages 231 - 236, XP000986273 [Y] 1-24 * Zusammenfassung; page 231 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90184-Q | [Y] - LIU HM, BOOTH TF, ROY P, "Interactions between bluetongue virus core and capsid proteins translated in vitro.", J GEN VIROL, (199310), vol. 73, pages 2577 - 2584, XP000999048 [Y] 1-24 * page 2577, column 2 * * "RESULTS"; page 2578, column 2 * | [Y] - REYNOLDS PN, DMITRIEV I, CURIEL DT, "insertion of rgd motif into the hi loop of adenovirus fiber protein alters the distribution of transgene expression of the systemically administered vector", GENE THERAPY, (199907), vol. 6, pages 1336 - 1339, XP000996471 [Y] 1-3,11,13,14 * page 1337, column 1, line 13 - line 44 * * page 1336, column 2, line 4 - line 9 * * page 1338, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300941 | [Y] - LI M. ET AL, "POLYOMAVIRUS VP1 PHOSPHORYLATION: COEXPRESSION WITH THE VP2 CAPSID PROTEIN MODULATES VP1 PHOSPHORYLATION IN SF9 INSECT CELLS.", PNAS, (199506), vol. 92, pages 5992 - 5996, XP002176024 [Y] 1-24 * INTRODUCTION; page 5992 * * DISCUSSION; page 5994 * * page 5996, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.13.5992 | [Y] - DELOS S. ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF THE POLYOMAVIRUS CAPSID PROTEINS VP2 AND VP3 IN ESCHERICHIA COLI: IN VITRO INTERACTIONS WITH RECOMBINANT VP1 CAPSOMERS", J VIROLOGY, (199512), vol. 69, no. 12, pages 7734 - 7742, XP002176025 [Y] 1-24 * page 7734, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 7741, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [PXY] - SCHMIDT U. ET AL, "MECHANISM OF ASSEMBLY OF RECOMBINANT MURINE POLYOMAVIRUS-LIKE PARTICLES", J VIROLOGY, (200002), vol. 74, no. 4, pages 1658 - 1662, XP002176026 [PX] 1-7,17-21,24 * DISCUSSION; page 1659, column 2; figure 1 * * page 1660, column 1 * * SIEHE OBEN * [Y] 8-16,22,23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.4.1658-1662.2000 | [A] - TOMILSON E, ROLLAND AP, "Controllable gene therapy Pharmaceutics of non-viral gene delivery systems", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1996), vol. 39, pages 357 - 372, XP004037341 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(95)00166-2 |