EP1238148 - PRESS DEVICE HAVING AN EXTENDED PRESS NIP FOR PRESSING A TRAVELING PAPER OR BOARD WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/37] | PRESS DEVICE HAVING AN EXTENDED PRESS NIP FOR PRESSING A TRAVELING PAPERBOARD WEB | ||
[2004/38] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Opposition rejected | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNELLMAN, Jorma Tupakatu 3 FIN-40500 Jyväskylä / FI | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Andréasson, Ivar, et al Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Andréasson, Ivar, et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Andréasson, Ivar Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 S-683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/37] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 00983448.2 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000IB01997 | Priority number, date | SE19990004537 | 10.12.1999 Original published format: SE 9904537 | [2002/37] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142559 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1238148 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238148 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
D21F3/0218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRESSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERLÄNGERTER PRESSZONE ZUM PRESSEN EINER LAUFENDEN PAPIER- ODER KARTONBAHN | [2004/39] | English: | PRESS DEVICE HAVING AN EXTENDED PRESS NIP FOR PRESSING A TRAVELING PAPER OR BOARD WEB | [2004/38] | French: | PRESSE A PINCE ALLONGEE POUR PRESSER UNE BANDE DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON EN MOUVEMENT | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/37] | PRESVORRICHTUNG MIT VERLÄNGERTER PRESSZONE ZUM PRESSEN VON LAUFENDEN PAPIERBAHNEN | ||
Former [2002/37] | PRESS DEVICE HAVING AN EXTENDED PRESS NIP FOR PRESSING A TRAVELING PAPERBOARD WEB | ||
Former [2002/37] | PRESSE PRESENTANT UN LARGE ESPACE DE PRESSAGE SERVANT AU PRESSAGE D'UNE BANDE DE CARTON EN MOUVEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2000 | Translation filed | 06.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 14.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.2005
09.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Andritz Küsters GmbH Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE Opponent's representative Henseler, Daniela, et al, et al Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.2005
09.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Andritz Küsters GmbH Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE Opponent's representative Henseler, Daniela, et al, et al Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.2005
09.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Andritz Küsters GmbH & Co. KG Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE Opponent's representative Henseler, Daniela, et al, et al Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.2005
Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE Opponent's representative Henseler, Daniela, et al, et al Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 27.01.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.06.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.01.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 02.03.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/21] | Appeal following opposition | 14.03.2008 | Appeal received No. T0560/08 | 20.05.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.03.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 02.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2005 | BE | 23.03.2005 | CH | 23.03.2005 | ES | 23.03.2005 | FR | 23.03.2005 | LI | 23.03.2005 | NL | 23.03.2005 | TR | 23.03.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | SE | 23.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | CY | 07.12.2005 | GB | 07.12.2005 | IE | 07.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
SE | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CY | 07.12.2005 | ||
GB | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
FR | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
SE | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CY | 07.12.2005 | ||
GB | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CY | 07.12.2005 | ||
GB | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
GB | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4917768 (ILMARINEN ANTTI I [SE]); | [A]EP0933471 (VALMET CORP [FI]) |