EP1231939 - ONCOLYTIC COMBINATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEISCH, Jerome, Herbert 10532 Coppergate Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 02 /
SAWYER, Jason, Scott 5718 North Winthrop Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | 03 /
TEICHER, Beverly, Ann 1357 Worchester Drive Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 04 /
BEIGHT, Douglas, Wade 3468 South County Road 600 West Frankfort, IN 46041 / US | 05 /
SMITH, Edward, C., R. 9969 Parkway Drive Fishers, IN 46038 / US | 06 /
MCMILLEN, William, Thomas 11665 Tidewater Drive Fishers, IN 46038 / US | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Burnside, Ivan John, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Burnside, Ivan John, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00983695.8 | 09.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000US30944 | Priority number, date | US19990164713P | 11.11.1999 Original published format: US 164713 P | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0134135 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1231939 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/235 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ONKOLYTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2002/34] | English: | ONCOLYTIC COMBINATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2002/34] | French: | COMBINAISONS ONCOLYTIQUES POUR TRAITEMENT DES CANCERS | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/51] | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9847890 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [A] 1,13-15,27-29,41,42 * claim 1 * * page 7, lines 18-21 * * page 8, line 24 - page 13, line 25 * * page 14, lines 17-34 *; | [A]EP0140709 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]) [A] 1,15,29 * claims 1,9 * * page 37, line 14 - page 38, line 16 * * page 39, line 31 - page 40, line 8 *; | [A]US4704400 (MILLER DOUGLAS K [US], et al) [A] 1,15,29 * claim 1 * * column 5, lines 25-59 *; | [A]EP0617032 (URIACH & CIA SA J [ES]) [A] 1,15,29 * claim 1 * * page 13, line 17 - page 14, line 12 * * page 15, lines 1-10 * |