EP1296803 - METHOD OF MAKING A SURFACE TREATING ARTICLE AND SUCH A SURFACE TREATING ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATES, Sean, M. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
CONWELL, Stan, L. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
DEVANEY, Douglas, E. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
ELGIN, Darla, A. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
FRITZ, Peter, J. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
FRY, Richard, L. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
LIVERMORE, Bruce W. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
MALASKE, James W. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
MCKAY, Bradley S. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
RICHTMAN, Paul J. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00983771.7 | 28.11.2000 | [2003/14] | WO2000US32375 | Priority number, date | US20000607210 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: US 607210 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0202278 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296803 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296803 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B24D7/16, B24D18/00, B24D13/00, B24D11/00, B24B45/00, B23B31/00 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
B23B31/11 (EP,US);
B24B45/00 (EP,US);
B24D11/008 (EP,US);
B24D13/20 (EP,US);
B24D18/0036 (EP,US);
B24D7/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEGENSTANDS ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG UND GEGENSTAND ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG | [2005/31] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING A SURFACE TREATING ARTICLE AND SUCH A SURFACE TREATING ARTICLE | [2003/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ET ARTICLE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE | [2003/14] |
Former [2003/14] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MITTELS ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG UND MITTEL ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2005 | BE | 10.08.2005 | CH | 10.08.2005 | ES | 10.08.2005 | FI | 10.08.2005 | IT | 10.08.2005 | LI | 10.08.2005 | NL | 10.08.2005 | TR | 10.08.2005 | DK | 10.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | SE | 10.11.2005 | CY | 28.11.2005 | IE | 28.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | PT | 10.01.2006 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
ES | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
TR | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
CY | 28.11.2005 | ||
IE | 28.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
ES | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
TR | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
IE | 28.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
TR | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
IE | 28.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
IE | 28.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1126136 (AMERICAN VELCRO INC) [Y] 1,30 * page 1, line 44 - line 73 * * figure 3 *; | [YA]US3851357 (RIBICH W, et al) [Y] 1,30 * column 3, line 11 - line 37 * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 36 * * claims 6,7 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2,3,7-13,16-18,20,23,24,26-28,34,37,39,51,52; | [XAY]WO9402284 (TULON CO [US]) [X] 42-47 * page 1, line 4 - line 11 * * page 4, line 2 - line 8 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 15 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 6 * * page 15, line 22 - line 30 * * page 17, line 27 - line 30 * * claims 3-5 * * figures 3,5,7 * [A] 1,2,4,5,17,18,21,22,30,31,33-35,52 [Y] 48-50; | [YA]US5580634 (STOUT GEORGE M [US], et al) [Y] 48,49 * column 12, line 15 - line 18 * * column 19, line 32 - line 55 * [A] 3,6,16,19,20,25,36,41,51,52; | [DYA]US6001202 (PENTTILA KENNETH L [US], et al) [DY] 50 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 21 * * claim 4 * * figures 2,3 *[A] 1,12,13,15,16,20,27,29,30,39,41,48,49,52 |