Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP1239916 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2074301 EP00984064 US0033318W US98449904



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2005085766Global Dossier 21.04.2005A1
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US73350600 08.12.2000
US98449904 09.11.2004
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2074301Global Dossier 18.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US0033318 07.12.2000
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1239916Global Dossier 23.11.2005B1
EP1239916 18.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US0033318 07.12.2000
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ATE310561T 15.12.2005T1
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US0033318 07.12.2000
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1105306T 03.03.2010T1
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US0033318 07.12.2000
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60024312T 17.08.2006T2
DE60024312D1 29.12.2005D1
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US0033318 07.12.2000
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1048604 04.05.2006B
HK1048604 11.04.2003A1
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US0033318 07.12.2000
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7087035 08.08.2006B2
US2002032415 14.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US73350600 08.12.2000
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0141863Global Dossier 14.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK1239916T 03.04.2006T3
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US21687700 07.07.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2253278T 01.06.2006T3
Priority number Date
US17270399 10.12.1999
US21687700 07.07.2000