EP1223809 - METHODS OF TREATING HAIR LOSS COMPRISING ADMINISTERING INDOLINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER 5323 Harry Hines Boulevard Dallas, TX 75235-9094 / US | [2002/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMMERS, Karen, Marie 3289 Shady Lane North Bend, OH 45052 / US | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00984592.6 | 20.10.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000US41383 | Priority number, date | US19990161577P | 26.10.1999 Original published format: US 161577 P | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0130151 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1223809 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/38, A61K31/40, A61K7/06 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
A61Q7/00 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/506 (EP);
A61K8/492 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2002/30] | A01N43/38, A61K31/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES HAARAUSFALLS DURCH VERABREICHUNG EINER INDOLIN-VERBINDUNG | [2002/30] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING HAIR LOSS COMPRISING ADMINISTERING INDOLINE COMPOUND | [2002/30] | French: | METHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA CHUTE DES CHEVEUX COMPRENANT L'ADMINISTRATION D'UN COMPOSE D'INDOLINE | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 03.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4556672 (KADIN SAUL B [US]) [DY] 1-23 * column 1, lines 18-20 *; | [DY]WO9631209 (PFIZER [US], et al) [DY] 1-23 * page 1, lines 20-23 * * page 2, lines 27,28 * * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 2; table 1 *; | [DY]EP0648488 (OREAL [FR]) [DY] 1-23 * page 2, lines 28-33 * * page 3, lines 24-30 * * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 18 * * page 6, lines 28-31 * [Y] 9-11,21-23 | International search | [Y]US5118703 (REITER LAWRENCE A [US], et al); | [Y]US5859042 (LEE SUNG JAI [US], et al) |