EP1228563 - ELECTRONICALLY COMMUTABLE MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/04] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LURK, Volker Am Katzensteg 11 77652 Offenburg / DE | 02 /
SUTTER, Joerg Mozartstrasse 37 76571 Gaggenau / DE | 03 /
KRAUTH, Wolfgang Römerstrasse 22 77855 Achern-Sasbachried / DE | 04 /
SCHWENK, Wolfgang Hubeneck 39 77704 Oberkirch-Tiergarten / DE | 05 /
BERLING, Claude 22, rue du Général de Gaulle F-67410 Drusenheim / FR | [2002/32] | Application number, filing date | 00984835.9 | 18.10.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000DE03667 | Priority number, date | DE1999151364 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19951364 | [2002/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0131772 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228563 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228563 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/14 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
H02P6/14 (EP,US);
H02P6/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCH KOMMUTIERBARER MOTOR | [2002/32] | English: | ELECTRONICALLY COMMUTABLE MOTOR | [2002/32] | French: | MOTEUR A COMMUTATION ELECTRONIQUE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]US6002226 (COLLIER-HALLMAN STEVEN JAMES [US], et al) [PX] 1-4 * column A * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 26 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 13 * * column 8, line 1 - column 9, line 42; figures 2,3,6,7,11 *; | [X]US5767641 (KERN ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * column A * * column 1, lines 34-40 * * column 4, lines 1-6; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5712539 (ZWEIGHAFT JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column A * * column 7, line 23 - column 9, line 44; figures 4-9 *; | [X]US5780986 (SHELTON BOYD N [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column A * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 21 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 58; figures 1,5-7 *; | [A]US4814674 (HRASSKY PETR [DE]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 32; figures 3A,3B *; | [DA]US5869946 (CAROBOLANTE FRANCESCO [US]) [DA] 1 * column A; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US4385265 (UZUKA MITSUO [JP]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 3 *; | [DA]DE3107623 (SONY CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 |