EP1242715 - LOCK ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIJNEN, Wilhelmus, Hubertus, Paulus, Maria Grote Hout of Koningsweg 49 NL-1951 GN Velsen / NL | [2002/39] | Application number, filing date | 00985068.6 | 16.11.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000EP11560 | Priority number, date | EP19990309153 | 17.11.1999 Original published format: EP 99309153 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0136784 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242715 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242715 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E21B23/02 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
E21B23/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/39] | English: | LOCK ASSEMBLY | [2002/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3698477 (RADIG GARY A ET AL) [X] 1-4,11,12 * column 2, line 29 - line 37 * * column 3, line 6 - line 60; figures 3-5 * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]US4116274 (RANKIN E EDWARD ET AL) [Y] 5,6 * column 2, line 33 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [X]US4139059 (CARMICHAEL JAMES T) [X] 1-3,11 * column 2, line 25 - line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4727939 (AIREY PETER J) [X] 1-3,11 * column 5, line 33 - line 43; figure 3 *; | [X]EP0872626 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL ;ANADRILL INT SA (PA)) [X] 1-3,11 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3749166 (YOUNG D) [A] 7 * column 2, line 16 - line 19 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 14; figures 1A,,1B * |