EP1155080 - FLAME-PROOF POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | [2005/41] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Basell Technology Company B.V. Hoeksteen 66 2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAGA, Vittorio Via G. Meli, 12 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
GOBERTI, Paolo Via Fondo Reno, 53 I-44049 Vigarano Mainarda / IT | 03 /
ZUCCHELLI, Ugo Via Rondona, 40/1 I-44018 Vigarano Pieve / IT | 04 /
MARCHINI, Roberta Via del Sandalo, 34/1 I-44019 Voghiera / IT | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P. le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | ||
Former [2001/47] | Gaverini, Gaetano, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00985186.6 | 18.12.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000EP12888 | Priority number, date | EP19990204494 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99204494 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0148075 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155080 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155080 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/02, C08L23/02 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/01 (EP,US);
C08K5/16 (KR);
C08L23/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/2217 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2201/02 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/01, C08L23/02 (US,EP);
C08K3/22, C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FLAMMGESCHÜTZTE POLYOLEFINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2001/47] | English: | FLAME-PROOF POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITIONS | [2001/47] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYOLEFINIQUES IGNIFUGEES | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]JPH07330980 ; | [A]EP0304030 (AM PRODUKTE AG [CH]) [A] 1-18 * example 1 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5859109 (WEIL EDWARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 4; examples 4-6 ** claims 1,2 *; | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 08, Database accession no. 1996-075051, XP002164609 & JPH07330980 A 19951219 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [DA] 1-18 * abstract * |