EP1234454 - CHARGING IN TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM OFFERING BROADCAST SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTV Corporation Ilmalantori 2 00240 Helsinki / FI | For all designated states TeliaSonera Finland Oyj Teollisuuskatu 15 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2005/27] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Alma Media OYJ Eteläesplanadi 14 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states TeliaSonera Finland Oyj Teollisuuskatu 15 00510 Helsinki / FI | |||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Alma Media OYJ Eteläesplanadi 14 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states TeliaSonera Oyj Teollisuuskatu 15 00510 Helsinki / FI | |||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Alma Media OYJ Eteläesplanadi 14 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states Sonera Oyj Teollisuuskatu 15 00510 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄKIPÄÄ, Risto Ylätie 11 FIN-50670 Otava / FI | 02 /
HAVIA, Jorma Unikkotie 2 A 4 FIN-01300 Vantaa / FI | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko, et al Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00985300.3 | 01.12.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000FI01064 | Priority number, date | FI19990002610 | 03.12.1999 Original published format: FI 992610 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0139576 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1234454 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234454 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/00 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
H04N21/8586 (EP);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04N21/2543 (EP);
H04N21/6175 (EP);
H04N7/17309 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBÜHRENERHEBUNG IN RUNDFUNKDIENSTE ANBIETENDEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2002/35] | English: | CHARGING IN TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM OFFERING BROADCAST SERVICES | [2002/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE TAXATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMMUNICATION OFFRANT DES SERVICES DE RADIODIFFUSION | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2008 | BE | 22.10.2008 | CY | 22.10.2008 | FI | 22.10.2008 | NL | 22.10.2008 | IE | 01.12.2008 | LU | 01.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | GR | 23.01.2009 | PT | 23.03.2009 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CY | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.12.2008 | ||
LU | 01.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.12.2008 | ||
LU | 01.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 22.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2634963 (VIDEO JUKEBOX NETWORK [US]); | [A]US5089885 (CLARK MORRIS [US]); | [A]EP0877499 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [AP]WO0004717 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US], et al) |