Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
25.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] |
02.04.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
27.03.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
27.03.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
21.11.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.11.2003 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
28.01.2003 | Change - extension states | |
22.11.2002 | Renewal fee | |
19.07.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
19.07.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
15.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.05.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.06.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.03.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication |