EP1235824 - VITAMIN D ANALOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galderma Research & Development, S.N.C. 635, route des Lucioles, Sophia Antipolis 06560 Valbonne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Galderma Research & Development, S.N.C. 635, route des Lucioles, Sophia Antipolis 06560 Valbonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARDON, Jean-Michel 21, chemin Plan Bergier F-06650 Le Rouret / FR | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Allab, Myriam, et al L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Allab, Myriam (FR), et al L'OREAL Département Propriété Industrielle 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle F-92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00985303.7 | 22.11.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000FR03250 | Priority number, date | FR19990014783 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9914783 | [2002/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138320 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1235824 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1235824 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/16, C07D213/30, A61K31/44, A61K31/381, A61K7/48, A61P17/00 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C07D333/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/67 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VITAMIN D - ANALOGA | [2002/36] | English: | VITAMIN D ANALOGUES | [2002/36] | French: | ANALOGUES DE LA VITAMINE D | [2002/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 19.05.2004 | [2006/51] | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0776881 (CIRD GALDERMA [FR]) [Y] 1,8-14 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0850909 (CIRD GALDERMA [FR]) [Y] 1,8-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - page 4, line 9 *; | [PX]WO0026167 (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR], et al) [PX] 1-14 * abstract ** example - * |