|
16.04.2004 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
18.02.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.02.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.02.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.02.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.01.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
39 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
16 |