EP1239769 - INGESTIBLE DEVICE FOR THE RELEASE OF SUBSTANCES AT DISTINCT LOCATIONS IN THE ALIMENTARY CANAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phaeton Research Ltd Mere Way, Ruddington Fields Ruddington Nottingham NG11 6JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Phaeton Research Ltd Mere Way, Ruddington Fields Ruddington, Nottingham NG11 6JS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Houzego, Peter John 8 The Drift Oakington Cambridge CB4 5AD / GB | 02 /
Westland, Duncan James 30 Plumian WAy Balsham Cambridge CB1 6EG / GB | 03 /
Morgan, Peter Neil 21 Bishops Road Cambridge CB2 2NQ / GB | 04 /
Wilding, Ian Robert 10 Glebe Street Beeston Nottingham NG9 1BZ / GB | 05 /
Hirst, Peter, Hanson 47 Charlock Gardens Bingham Nottinghamshire NG13 8UH / GB | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Powell, Timothy John Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00985571.9 | 14.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000GB04814 | Priority number, date | GB19990030000 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9930000 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0145789 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239769 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/07, A61B5/00, A61F2/02, A61M31/00 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
A61M31/002 (EP,US);
A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61M31/00 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0002 (EP,US);
A61J3/07 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3523 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1042 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINNEHMBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR FREISETZUNG VON SUBSTANZEN AN DEFINIERTEN ORTEN DES VERDAUUNGSTRAKTES | [2002/38] | English: | INGESTIBLE DEVICE FOR THE RELEASE OF SUBSTANCES AT DISTINCT LOCATIONS IN THE ALIMENTARY CANAL | [2002/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF INGERABLE | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP03078778.2 / EP1398052 | EP08075824.6 / EP2016898 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1076322 (JEAN PIERRE PERRENOUD DR) [A] 7-25 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3659600 (MERRILL EDWARD W) [A] 36 * abstract *; | [A]US4239040 (HOSOYA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,30,60 * figures 4-6; examples 2,3 *; | [Y]JPS58121938 (FUNAKUBO HIROYASU, et al) [Y] 36-46 * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US4425117 (HUGEMANN BERHHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 36-46 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 10; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 1 * [A] 1,3,30,60; | [A]DE3339323 (BUSCH ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1,3,30,60 * abstract *; | [A]DE4037043 (HANACK ULRICH DR MED [DE], et al) [A] 47* column 3, lines 8-60; figure 1 *; | [DA]US5167626 (CASPER ROBERT A [US], et al) [DA] 1,3,30,60 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5217449 (YUDA SHUNICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 7-25 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5279607 (SCHENTAG JEROME J [US], et al) [DA] 1,3,30,60 * abstract * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 2; figure 1 * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 13; figure 2 *; | [DA] - LAMBERT A ET AL, "AUTONOMOUS TELEMETRIC CAPSULE TO EXPLORE THE SMALL BOWEL", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING,GB,PETER PEREGRINUS LTD. STEVENAGE, (19910301), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 0140-0118, pages 191 - 196, XP000230962 [DA] 1,3,30,60 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02447107 | [Y] - MUELLER J S ET AL, "TWO NOVEL TECHNIQUES FOR ENHANCHING POWERING AND CONTROL OF MULTIPLE INDUCTIVELY-POWERED BIOMEDICAL IMPLANTS", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS,US,NEW-YORK, NY: IEEE, (19970609), ISBN 0-7803-3584-8, pages 289 - 292, XP000805394 [Y] 7-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1997.608708 | [A] - TOFY MUSSIVAND ET AL, "A TRANSCUTANEOUS ENERGY AND INFORMATION TRANSFER SYSTEM FOR IMPLANTED MEDICAL DEVICES", ASAIO JOURNAL,US,J.B.LIPPINCOTT CO.,HAGERSTOWN,MD, (19950701), vol. 41, no. 3, ISSN 1058-2916, pages 253 - 258, XP000542902 [A] 7-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5167626 | US5279607 |