Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3960373B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2007 | B2 | JP2003517250 | 20.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0024105 | 03.10.2000 | GB0004819 | 15.12.2000 | GB9929577 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1240728 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0024105 | 03.10.2000 | GB0004819 | 15.12.2000 | GB9929577 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0024105D0 | 15.11.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9929577 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9929577D0 | 09.02.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9929577 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0145297 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0024105 | 03.10.2000 | GB9929577 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100596975B | Global Dossier | 04.07.2006 | B1 | KR20020065576 | 13.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0024105 | 03.10.2000 | GB9929577 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1203626C | 25.05.2005 | C | CN1433598 | 30.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0024105 | 03.10.2000 | GB9929577 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003103469 | 05.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0024105 | 03.10.2000 | GB9929577 | 15.12.1999 |