EP1240728 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING THE TRANSMISSION POWER IN A RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [2008/07] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED Roke Manor, Old Salisbury Lane Romsey, Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SETTY, David 4 Waverley Road Crosby, Liverpool L23 3AJ / GB | 02 /
SOMMER, Volker Schwabstedter Weg 6 13503 Berlin / DE | 03 /
OESTREICH, Stefan Austrasse 18 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 04 /
LEHMANN, Gerald Kanzlerweg 18 12101 Berlin / DE | [2002/49] |
Former [2002/38] | 01 /
SETTY, David 33 Avon Crescent Romsey, Hampshire S051 5PX / GB | ||
02 /
SOMMER, Volker Schwabstedter Weg 6 13503 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
OESTREICH, Stefan Austrasse 18 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | |||
04 /
LEHMANN, Gerald Kanzlerweg 18 12101 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2008/07] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/38] | Humphrey-Evans, Edward John, et al c/o Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00985575.0 | 15.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000GB04819 | Priority number, date | GB19990029577 | 15.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9929577 | GB20000024105 | 03.10.2000 Original published format: GB 0024105 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145297 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240728 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
H04W52/267 (EP,US);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/0013 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SENDELEISTUNGSREGELUNG IN EINEM RADIOKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2002/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING THE TRANSMISSION POWER IN A RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2002/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LA PUISSANCE D'EMISSION DANS UN SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5621723 (WALTON JR JAY R [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 14 - line 22 ** column 8, line 18 - line 26 *; | [A]US5822318 (TIEDEMANN JR EDWARD G [US], et al) [A] 1,4-10,13-16 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 19; figure 2 *; | [X]WO9920011 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 5, line 14 - line 28 *; | [A]EP0942550 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,2,4-11,13-16 * column 9, line 18 - line 53 * * column 14, line 22 - line 34 * |