EP1252535 - OPTICAL DISTANCE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instro Precision Limited Hornet Close Pysons Road Industrial Estate Broadstairs Kent CT2 OHL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Instro Precision Limited Hornet Close Pysons Road Industrial Estate Broadstairs Kent CT2 OHL / GB | ||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Instro Precision Limited Hornet Closem Pysons Road Industrial Estate Broadshire, Kent CT10 2YD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORCOM, Christopher John Instro Precision Limited Hornet Close Pysons Road Industrial Estate Broadstairs Kent CT2 0HL / GB | [2004/06] |
Former [2002/44] | 01 /
MORCOM, John Instro Precision Limited Hornet Close Pysons Road Industrial Estate Broadstairs Kent CT2 0HL / GB | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00985681.6 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/44] | WO2000GB04968 | Priority number, date | GB20000001803 | 26.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0001803 | GB20000005347 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0005347 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0155746 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1252535 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252535 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/08 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
G01S17/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE DISTANZMESSUNG | [2002/44] | English: | OPTICAL DISTANCE MEASUREMENT | [2002/44] | French: | MESURE DE DISTANCE OPTIQUE | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 22.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CY | 31.03.2004 | FI | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | ES | 12.07.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | IE | 21.12.2004 | LU | 21.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CY | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
IE | 21.12.2004 | ||
LU | 21.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
IE | 21.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]GB1585054 (SECR DEFENCE) [DA] 1,12* the whole document *; | [A]US5805468 (BLOEHBAUM FRANK [DE]) [A] 1,12 * claims 1-3 *; | [DPA]DE19949803 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [DPA] 1,12 * abstract * |