Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003517477 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17031999 | 13.12.1999 | US0033097 | 07.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2254701 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US17031999 | 13.12.1999 | US0033097 | 07.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1240160 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2003 | A4 | EP1240160 | 18.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17031999 | 13.12.1999 | US0033097 | 07.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2392584 | 14.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17031999 | 13.12.1999 | US0033097 | 07.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6602872 | 05.08.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US17031999 | 13.12.1999 | US71727700 | 21.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0142241 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17031999 | 13.12.1999 |