EP1240160 - SUBSTITUTED PYRIDAZINES HAVING CYTOKINE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | 14.05.2004 | Change - representative | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCINTYRE, Charles, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
LIVERTON, Nigel, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
CLAREMON, David, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2002/38] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00986274.9 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000US33097 | Priority number, date | US19990170319P | 13.12.1999 Original published format: US 170319 P | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142241 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240160 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, C07D491/113, A61K31/501, A61K31/506, A61K31/5377, A61K31/541, C07D491/10, A61K31/505, A61K31/55, A61K31/535, A61K31/54 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, C07D491/113, A61K31/501, A61K31/506, A61K31/5377, A61K31/541, A61K31/55 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | 15.07.2002 | LT | 15.07.2002 | LV | 15.07.2002 | MK | 15.07.2002 | RO | 15.07.2002 | SI | 15.07.2002 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PYRIDAZINE MIT CYTOKIN-HEMMENDER AKTIVITÄT | [2002/38] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PYRIDAZINES HAVING CYTOKINE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY | [2002/38] | French: | PYRIDAZINES SUBSTITUEES PRESENTANT UNE ACTIVITE INHIBITRICE DES CYTOKINES | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO9932448 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) |