EP1247168 - MEMORY SHARED BETWEEN PROCESSING THREADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLRICH, Gilbert 4 Cider Mill Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 02 /
ADILETTA, Matthew, J. 20 Monticello Drive Worcester, MA 01603 / US | 03 /
WHEELER, William 9 Darlene Drive Southborough, MA 01772 / US | 04 /
CUTTER, Daniel 14 Walnut Street Townsend, MA 01469 / US | 05 /
BERNSTEIN, Debra 321 Old Lancaster Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/41] | 01 /
WOLRICH, Gilbert 4 Cider Mill Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | ||
02 /
ADILETTA, Matthew, J. 20 Monticello Drive Worcester, MA 01603 / US | |||
03 /
WHEELER, William 9 Darlene Drive Southborough, MA 01772 / US | |||
04 /
CUTTER, Daniel 14 Walnut Street Townsend, MA 01469 / US | |||
05 /
BERNSTEIN, Debra 443 Peakham Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00986590.8 | 19.12.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000US34537 | Priority number, date | US20000479377 | 05.01.2000 Original published format: US 479377 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0150247 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1247168 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1247168 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/00 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
G06F9/5016 (EP,US);
G06F9/3004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHER, DER ZWISCHEN VERARBEITENDEN THREADS GETEILT IST | [2002/41] | English: | MEMORY SHARED BETWEEN PROCESSING THREADS | [2002/41] | French: | MEMOIRE PARTAGEE ENTRE PROCESSUS ELEMENTAIRES DE TRAITEMENT | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2004 | BE | 27.10.2004 | CH | 27.10.2004 | CY | 27.10.2004 | FI | 27.10.2004 | IT | 27.10.2004 | LI | 27.10.2004 | NL | 27.10.2004 | SE | 27.10.2004 | TR | 27.10.2004 | LU | 19.12.2004 | IE | 20.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | DK | 27.01.2005 | GR | 27.01.2005 | ES | 07.02.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
CY | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IT | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
SE | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
LU | 19.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
CY | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
SE | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
LU | 19.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
CY | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
LU | 19.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0809180 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 14-19,21-23,27,30 * page 3, line 54 - line 55 *; | [XAY]US5905889 (WILHELM JR GEORGE WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1,10-13,29 * column 4, line 53 - line 67 * * column 7, line 16 - line 35 * * column 8, line 20 - line 30 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 32 * [A] 5-8 [Y] 14-19,21-23,27,30; | [A] - HYDE R L, "Overview of memory management", BYTE, APRIL 1988, USA, vol. 13, no. 4, ISSN 0360-5280, pages 219 - 225, XP002162801 [A] 1,14,21,29,30 * figure 1 * | Examination | US5542070 | US5946487 |