EP1226639 - CONDUCTOR BAR ARRANGEMENT FOR AN ELECTRICAL SWITCHPANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Mario Gartenstrasse 34 04178 Leipzig / DE | 02 /
BÜSSERT, Stephan Böhlitzer Strasse 38 04275 Leipzig / DE | 03 /
KLAUS, Matthias Mittelstrasse 34 06888 Zörnigall / DE | [2002/31] | Application number, filing date | 00987059.3 | 27.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000DE03841 | Priority number, date | DE1999153561 | 03.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19953561 | [2002/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0133681 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226639 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226639 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/21, H02G5/02 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
H02G5/025 (EP);
H02B1/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [2003/39] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMSCHIENENANORDUNG FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES SCHALTFELD | [2002/31] | English: | CONDUCTOR BAR ARRANGEMENT FOR AN ELECTRICAL SWITCHPANEL | [2002/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE RAIL CONDUCTEUR POUR UN SYSTEME DE COMMUTATION ELECTRIQUE | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 21.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE754048 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 2, line 36 - line 46 *; | [A]GB914488 (MARRYAT & PLACE LTD) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0004266 (ACEC [BE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 4 - line 9 * |