EP1241257 - NOVEL TACHYKININ-LIKE POLYPEPTIDES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Yasuaki 36-16, Sakuragaoka-machi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0832 / JP | 02 /
NISHI, Kazunori 3 Hayward Road London N20 OHA / GB | 03 /
KITADA, Chieko 2-8, Minamikoyocho 1-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0073 / JP | 04 /
INATOMI, Nobuhiro 1-2-920, Yamazaki 2-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-0001 / JP | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Lewin, John Harvey Takeda Patent Office, 11-12 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00987681.4 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000JP09083 | Priority number, date | JP19990362638 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36263899 | JP20000066714 | 10.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000066714 | [2002/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146415 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241257 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12P21/02, C12P21/08, C07K16/18, C07K14/475, G01N33/50, G01N33/15, A61K38/17, C07K7/22 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K14/475 (EP,US);
C07K7/22 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12P21/02, C12P21/08, C07K16/18, C07K14/475, G01N33/50, G01N33/15, A61K38/17, A61P9/12, A01K67/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TACHYKININ-ÄHNLICHE POLYPEPTIDE UND DEREN ANWENDUNG | [2002/38] | English: | NOVEL TACHYKININ-LIKE POLYPEPTIDES AND USE THEREOF | [2002/38] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE TYPE TACHYKININE ET UTILISATION ASSOCIEE | [2002/38] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2002 | Translation filed | 18.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.03.2011 | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/34] | 31.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.04.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PAIGE CJ, WU GE, ZHANG Y, "Preprotachykinin-C (PPT-C) precursor protein", GENESEQ, DERWENT, (19980528), Database accession no. AAW48949, XP002298947 [X] 1-4,8-21,25-32 * the whole document * | [X] - YANKNER BA, "Substance P [D-Ala 4]", GENESEQ, DERWENT, (19920220), Database accession no. AAR21964, XP002298948 [X] 1-4,8-21,25-32 * the whole document * | [X] - YUE K.K.M ET AL., "Desmocollin 3A/3B precursor", UNIPROT, (19971101), Database accession no. Q28060, XP002298949 [X] 1-4,8-21,25-32 * the whole document * | [X] - WAUGH DAVID ET AL, "Tachykinins With Unusual Structural Features From a Urodele, the Amphiuma, an Elasmobranch, the Hammerhead Shark, and an Agnathan, the River Lamprey", PEPTIDES (TARRYTOWN), (1995), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0196-9781, pages 615 - 621, XP002298946 [X] 1-4,8-21,25-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0196-9781(95)00010-H | International search | [X]JPH10306099 (INST NOGUCHI); | [X]WO9953021 (BRESAGEN LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO9946367 (CELL ACTIVATION INC [US], et al); | [X]US5891842 (KREAM RICHARD M [US]); | [X]JPH05163159 (NIPPON ZENYAKU KOGYO KK); | [X]WO8603495 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]); | [X]WO9420500 (PFIZER [US], et al); | [X]EP0532456 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X] - T. KEMPE ET AL., "Multiple-copy genes: Production and modification of monomeric peptides from large multimeric fusion proteins", GENE, (1985), vol. 39, no. 2/3, pages 239 - 245, XP002938014 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(85)90318-X | [X] - A.Y. JENG ET AL., "A radioimmunoasay for measuring alpha-amidating enzyme activity", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 185, no. 2, pages 213 - 219, XP002938015 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(90)90282-E | [X] - G. BITAN ET AL., "Synthesis and biological activity of novel backbone-bicyclic substance-P analogs containing lactam and disulfide bridges", J. PEPT. RES., (1997), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 421 - 426, XP002938016 | [X] - EISUKE MUNATAKA ET AL., "Tachykinin", KOKYU, (1988), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 764 - 777, XP002938017 | [X] - YASUYUKI KATO ET AL., "Shinkei peptide sei no ketsuatsu koukazai no drag design", ASAHI GLASS ZAIDAN KENKYU HOUKOKU, (1991), vol. 59, pages 115 - 124, XP002938018 | [X] - A.S. DUTTA ET AL., "Analogues of substance P. peptides containing D-amino acid residues in various positions of substance P and displaying agonist or receptor selective antagonist effects", J. MED. CHEM., (1986), vol. 29, no. 7, pages 1163 - 1170, XP002938019 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00157a008 | [X] - SHIGETADA NAKANISHI ET AL., "Shinkei peptide to shinkei naibunpitsu chousetsu", IGAKU NO AYUMI, (1988), vol. 146, no. 4, pages 223 - 230, XP002938020 |