EP1243003 - POLYCARBOSILANE ADHESION PROMOTERS FOR LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANT POLYMERIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Tian-An 1889 Misty Woods Drive Duluth, GA 30097 / US | 02 /
WU, Hui-Jung 38770 Buckboard Common Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 03 /
GEORGE, Anna, M. 209 S. Bayview Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
KREISTLER, Lau, S., Y. 871 Rubis Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00988217.6 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US34689 | Priority number, date | US19990471299 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 471299 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146963 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243003 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/46, H01L21/312 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H01L21/02126 (EP,US);
H01B3/46 (EP,KR,US);
C09D171/00 (EP,US);
C09D183/16 (EP,US);
H01L21/02118 (EP,US);
H01L21/312 (US);
H01L21/3121 (US);
H05K3/389 (EP,US);
H01L21/02282 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D171/00, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAFTVERMITTLER AUF BASIS VON POLYKARBOSILANEN FÜR POLYMERE MIT NIEDRIGER DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTE | [2002/39] | English: | POLYCARBOSILANE ADHESION PROMOTERS FOR LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANT POLYMERIC MATERIALS | [2002/39] | French: | PROMOTEURS D'ADHESION POLYCARBOSILANE POUR MATERIAUX A FAIBLE CONSTANTE DIELECTRIQUE | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 01.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/03] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4436675 (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-15,17,19 * page 15, line 9 - line 15; example 2; claims 1-19 *; | [X]EP0668254 (SOLVAY DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2 * example 4; claims 2-6 *; | [X]US5602060 (KOBAYASHI MICHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, lines 9-34; example 1; claims 1-10 *; | [X]US5605998 (KOBAYASHI TOSHI-AKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * example 1; claims 1-3,13-15 *; | [A]EP0764704 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-20* example 1; claims 1-9 *; | [X]WO9844018 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2; | [X]US5952046 (CHAYKA PAUL V [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 9, line 22 - line 62 *; | [PX]EP0970981 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * examples IV-1,IV-2; claims 1-52 *; | [PX]WO0075975 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [PX] 1,2 * examples 3,5; claims 1-24 *; | [X] - RUSHKIN I L ET AL, "MODIFICATION OF A HYPERBRANCHED HYDRIDOPOLYCARBOSILANE AS A ROUTE TO NEW POLYCARBOSILANES", MACROMOLECULES,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, (19970602), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 3141 - 3146, XP000691129 [X] 1,2 * abstract;; page 3141 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma961664p | [X] - WEBER W P, "POLYCARBOSILANES - POLYMERS WITH BACKBONE VARIABILITY", TRENDS IN POLYMER SCIENCE,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, (19931101), vol. 1, no. 11, ISSN 0966-4793, pages 356 - 360, XP000417188 [X] 1,2 * page 358 * |