EP1242332 - METHOD FOR MAKING CARBON BLOCKS HIGHLY RESISTANT TO THERMAL SHOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINIUM PECHINEY 7, Place du Chancelier Adenauer 75218 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states FCB Aluminium 32, rue Fleury Neuvesel 69700 Givors / FR | [2008/11] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states ALUMINIUM PECHINEY 7, Place du Chancelier Adenauer 75218 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For all designated states FCB Aluminium 32, rue Fleury Neuvesel 69700 Givors / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREYER, Christian L'Echaillon-Hermillon F-73300 St. Jean de Maurienne / FR | 02 /
SAMANOS, Bernard Le Plan des Villards F-73300 St. Jean de Maurienne / FR | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Marsolais, Richard Alcan France S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 217 Cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Marsolais, Richard Péchiney, Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00988860.3 | 21.11.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000FR03226 | Priority number, date | FR19990014800 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9914800 | [2002/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138253 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242332 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242332 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/532, C25C3/12 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C25C3/125 (EP,US);
C04B35/532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 06.06.2002 | SI | 06.06.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RUSSBLOCKES MIT HOHER RESISTENZ GEGENÜBER THERMISCHEN SCHOCKS | [2002/39] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING CARBON BLOCKS HIGHLY RESISTANT TO THERMAL SHOCK | [2002/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE BLOCS CARBONES A HAUTE RESISTANCE AUX CHOCS THERMIQUES | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2008 | CY | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | IE | 12.03.2008 | IT | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | PT | 18.08.2008 | LU | 21.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
LU | 21.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3540169 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-19* figure 2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5299745 (FISCHER WERNER [CH]) [A] 1-19 * figure 1; claims 1-8 *; | [XDA]FR2740771 (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM [FR]) [XD] 19 * page 1, paragraph 1; claims 1-8; table 1 * [A] 1-18 |