EP1165453 - INFRARED AND ULTRAVIOLET RADIATION ABSORBING GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2007/08] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Yukihito Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00989003.9 | 27.12.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000JP09337 | Priority number, date | JP20000001473 | 07.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000001473 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0149622 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165453 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165453 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C4/08, C03C4/02, C03C3/095 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C03C4/02 (EP,US);
C03C3/095 (EP,US);
C03C4/082 (EP,US);
C03C4/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | INFRAROTE UND ULTRAVIOLETTE STRAHLUNGEN ABSORBIERENDES GLAS | [2002/01] | English: | INFRARED AND ULTRAVIOLET RADIATION ABSORBING GLASS | [2002/01] | French: | VERRE ABSORBANT LES INFRAROUGES ET LES ULTRAVIOLETS | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0561337 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * example 1 ** claims 2,4 *; | [A]EP0565882 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * example 1 *; | [A]GB2274841 (PILKINGTON PLC [GB]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * examples 8,22 *; | [X]EP0834481 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6 * abstract * * page 3, line 17 - line 24 * * example 1 * | by applicant | JPH04310539 | JPH0578147 | JPH0656466 |