EP1237841 - METHOD OF PURIFYING LACTIC ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purac Biochem B.V. P.B. 21 4200 AA Gorinchem / NL | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN KRIEKEN, Jan Het Fluitketeltje 25 NL-4207 WN Gorinchem / NL | 02 /
DE VRIES, Johannes, Jeichinus Het Hooge Land 75 NL-4213 DB Dalem / NL | 03 /
KOK, Symone Johan de Kreijstraat 30 NL-3381 DG Giessenburg / NL | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/37] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00989027.8 | 24.11.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000NL00860 | Priority number, date | NL19991013870 | 16.12.1999 Original published format: NL 1013870 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0144157 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1237841 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1237841 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/52, C07C69/68 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
C07C67/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/52, C07C69/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN VON MILCHSÄUREESTERN | [2002/37] | English: | METHOD OF PURIFYING LACTIC ACID ESTERS | [2002/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION D'ESTERS D'ACIDE LACTIQUE | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 10.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.2004 | CY | 21.01.2004 | TR | 21.01.2004 | GR | 21.04.2004 | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 21.01.2004 | |
TR | 21.01.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 21.01.2004 | |
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 21.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6226249 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870630), vol. 01, no. 1202, Database accession no. (C - 432), & JP62026249 A 19870204 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |