13.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
23.02.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
07.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
23.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
27.08.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] |
22.07.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
20.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
13.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
06.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
03.09.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
27.08.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.08.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.04.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
08.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.08.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
09.08.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
05.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|