EP1241988 - DEVICE FOR COMPRESSION OF THE LOWER EXTREMITIES FOR MEDICAL IMAGING PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danielsson, Barbro Almvägen 28 437 40 Lindome / SE | For all designated states Nicklasson, Thomas Kuttervägen 39 439 35 Onsala / SE | For all designated states Willen, Jan A.G. Krikonvägen 19 435 43 Mölnlycke / SE | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | ||
Former [2002/39] | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 00989129.2 | 20.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000SE02629 | Priority number, date | SE19990004662 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: SE 9904662 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145564 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241988 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1241988 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/04, A61B5/055 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/4528 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/702 (US);
A61B6/032 (KR);
A61B6/0414 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR KOMPRESSION DER UNTEREN GLIEDMASSEN ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN BILDGEBUNG | [2002/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR COMPRESSION OF THE LOWER EXTREMITIES FOR MEDICAL IMAGING PURPOSES | [2002/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION DES EXTREMITES INFERIEURES A DES FINS D'IMAGERIE MEDICALE | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 29.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2004 | BE | 20.10.2004 | CH | 20.10.2004 | CY | 20.10.2004 | FI | 20.10.2004 | FR | 20.10.2004 | IT | 20.10.2004 | LI | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | SE | 20.10.2004 | TR | 20.10.2004 | IE | 20.12.2004 | LU | 20.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | DK | 20.01.2005 | GR | 20.01.2005 | ES | 31.01.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
CY | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
IT | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SE | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
LU | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
CY | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SE | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
LU | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
CY | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
LU | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3629581 (SMITH JEFFREY P); | [A]US4202355 (LOEFFLER CECIL W [US]); | [A]US4320749 (HIGHLEY ROBERT D); | [A]US4407277 (ELLISON ARTHUR E [US]); | [A]US5541515 (TSUJITA KAZUHIKO [JP]); | [A]US5562094 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]); | [A]US5810006 (VOTRUBA JAN [US], et al) |