Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1269260
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.01.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] |
05.10.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.04.2005 |
First examination report |
|
19.04.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.05.2003 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
07.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
13.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.11.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
15.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
25.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|