Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0150191 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003529789 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US71561200 | 17.11.2000 | US0034444 | 18.12.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1141774 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2003 | A4 | EP1141774 | 10.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0001166 | 18.01.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2616600 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0001166 | 18.01.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2583001 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US71561200 | 17.11.2000 | US0034444 | 18.12.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1269260 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2003 | A4 | EP1269260 | 02.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71561200 | 17.11.2000 | US0034444 | 18.12.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0007145 | 16.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0001166 | 18.01.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0016922 | 15.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US71561200 | 17.11.2000 | US0034444 | 18.12.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2341287 | 01.01.2002 | C | CA2341287 | 24.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0001166 | 18.01.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2396002 | 12.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71561200 | 17.11.2000 | US0034444 | 18.12.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE1141774T | 07.02.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0001166 | 18.01.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2161200T | 01.12.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6221570 | 24.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0150196 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71561200 | 17.11.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6455236 | 24.09.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US71561200 | 17.11.2000 | US47756500 | 06.01.2000 |