EP1269260 - ONE-PART BLEACH-FIX LIQUID CONCENTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trebla Chemical Company 8417 Chapin Industrial Drive St. Louis, MO 63114 / US | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPAI, Laszlo 523 Elm Crossing Court Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 00989310.8 | 18.12.2000 | [2003/01] | WO2000US34444 | Priority number, date | US20000477565 | 06.01.2000 Original published format: US 477565 | US20000715612 | 17.11.2000 Original published format: US 715612 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0150196 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1269260 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/42 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G03C7/421 (EP);
G03C7/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINTEILIGES KONZENTRAT EINER BLEICHFIXIERLÖSUNG | [2003/01] | English: | ONE-PART BLEACH-FIX LIQUID CONCENTRATES | [2003/01] | French: | CONCENTRES LIQUIDES DE BLANCHIMENT-FIXAGE A UN COMPOSANT | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1286111 (KMS INDUSTRIES INC) [X] 1-23 * example 1 *; | [X]GB1528235 (AGFA GEVAERT AG) [X] 1-23 * page 6, line 78 - line 101 *; | [X]US3620725 (KOSTA JOHN A) [X] 1-23 * page 5, line 41 - line 50 *; | [X]GB1229077 (EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY) [X] 1-23 * claims 1,4 * | International search | [X]US3293036 ; | [X]US3879203 ; | [Y]US3702247 ; | [Y]US4814260 |