03.11.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
12.07.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.01.2006 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
03.01.2006 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.01.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
29.12.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.12.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.12.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.08.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2005 |
First examination report |
|
20.04.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2005 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
18.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
11.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.12.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.01.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
14.06.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] |
14.06.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] |
07.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|