EP1226553 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY 10900 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Case Western Reserve University 10900 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, H., David 19801 Malvern Road Shaker Heights, OH 44122 / US | 02 /
RATCHESON, Robert A. 2871 Attleboro Road Shaker Heights, Ohio 44120 / US | [2005/21] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
DEAN, H., David 19801 Malvern Road Shaker Heights, OH 44122 / US | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00989754.7 | 03.11.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US41821 | Priority number, date | US19990163323P | 03.11.1999 Original published format: US 163323 P | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0133511 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1226553 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES DREI-DIMENSIONALEN MODELS | [2002/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL MODEL | [2002/31] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MODELE EN TROIS DIMENSIONS | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/49] | Request for further processing for: | 21.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2004 | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2324470 (CUSTOMFLEX LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 10,13,14,17 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 14 * | [XA] - ZACHOW S ET AL, "Optimized arrangement of osseointegrated implants: a surgical planning system for the fixation of facial prostheses", PROCEEDINGS OF 13TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ASSISTED RADIOLOGY AND SURGERY (CARS'99), PARIS, FRANCE, 23-26 JUNE 1999, 1999, Amsterdam, Netherlands, Elsevier Science, Netherlands, ISBN 0-444-50290-4, pages 942 - 946, XP001011404 [X] 1-4,6,7,10,13-15,17 * sections 3, 3.1-3.3 * [A] 5,8,9,11,12,19 | [XA] - NOORDMANS H J ET AL, "Localisation of subdural EEG electrode bundles in an interactive volume rendering framework", MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION - MICCAI'99. SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL.1679), CAMBRIDGE, UK, 1999, Berlin, Germany, Springer-Verlag, Germany, (19990919), ISBN 3-540-66503-X, pages 734 - 741, XP001011391 [X] 1-4,6,8 * abstract * * sections 1, 1.1, 2 * [A] 10,11,13-15,17 | [XAY] - WELLS W ET AL, "VIDEO REGISTRATION USING FIDUCIALS FOR SURGICAL ENHANCED REALITY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY,US,NEW YORK, 1EEE, (19931028), vol. CONF. 15, pages 24 - 25, XP000431483 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-9,11,12,15,16,18-20 [Y] 10,13,14,17 |