EP1254178 - SYNTHESIS OF A POTENT PARAMAGNETIC AGONIST (EPM-3) OF THE MELANOCYTE STIMULATING HORMONE CONTAINING AMINO ACID-TYPE STABLE FREE RADICAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conselho Nacional de Desenvolvimento Cientifico e Tecnologico - CNPQ Avenida W3 Norte Quadra 507/B, Bloco B, Edificio CNPq, SEPN CEP-70741-901 Brasilia, DF / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Conselho Nacional de Desenvolvimento Cientifico e Technologico - CNPQ Avenida W3 Norte Quadra 507/B, Bloco B, Edificio CNPq, SEPN CEP-70741-901 Brasilia, DF / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYUICHI NAKAIE, Clovis Rua 3 de maio 100 CEP-04044-020 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | 02 /
DOS REIS BARBOSA, Simone Rua 3 de maio 100 CEP-04044-020 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | 03 /
MAFFUD CILLI, Eduardo Rua 3 de maio 100 CEP-04004-020 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | 04 /
LAMY-FREUND, Maria, Tereza, Cidade Universitaria Dept. De Fisica CEP-66318 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | 05 /
ITO SIUITI, Amando, Cidade Universitaria Dept. de Fisica CEP-66318 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | 06 /
VISCONTI, Maria, Aparecida, Cidade Universitaria Dept. de Fisiologia CEP-11176 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | 07 /
DE LAURO CASTRUCCI, Ana Maria, Cidade Universitaria Dept. de Fisiologia CEP-11176 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | [2003/03] |
Former [2002/45] | 01 /
RYUICHI NAKAIE, Clovis Rua 3 de maio 100 CEP-04044-020 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | ||
02 /
DOS REIS BARBOSA, Simone Rua 3 de maio 100 CEP-04044-020 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | |||
03 /
MAFFUD CILLI, Eduardo Rua 3 de maio 100 CEP-04004-020 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | |||
04 /
LAMY-FREUND, Maria, Tereza, Cidade Universitaria Dept. De Fisica CEP-66318 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | |||
05 /
ITO SIUITI, Amando, Cidade Universitaria Dept. de Fisica CEP-66318 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | |||
06 /
VISCONTI, Maria, Aparecida, Cidade Universitaria Dept. de Fisiologia CEP-11176 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | |||
07 /
DE LEME CASTRUCCI, Ana Maria, Cidade Universitaria Dept. de Fisiologia CEP-11176 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | Representative(s) | Barendregt, Frank, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Barendregt, Frank, Drs., et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [2002/45] | van der Kloet-Dorleijn, G.W.F. Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 00989769.5 | 22.12.2000 | [2002/45] | WO2000BR00161 | Priority number, date | BR19999906090 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: BR 9906090 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0146217 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254178 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/685, G01N33/532, G01N33/543 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
C07K14/685 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | C07K16/00, C07K1/04, C07K1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESE EINES POTENTEN PARAMAGNETISCHEN AGONISTEN (EPM-3) DES MELANOCYTEN STIMULIERENDEN HORMONS BEINHALTEND EINE AMINOSÄUREN-ÄHNLICHES STABILES FREIES RADIKAL | [2002/45] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF A POTENT PARAMAGNETIC AGONIST (EPM-3) OF THE MELANOCYTE STIMULATING HORMONE CONTAINING AMINO ACID-TYPE STABLE FREE RADICAL | [2002/45] | French: | SYNTHESE D'UN PUISSANT AGONISTE PARAMAGNETIQUE (EPM-3) DE L'HORMONE STIMULATRICE DU MELANOCYTE $g(a) CONTENANT UN RADICAL LIBRE STABLE DU TYPE ACIDE AMINE | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 11.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/29] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.2003 | 31.12.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2005 | 31.12.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO0049867 (CONSELHO NACIONAL DE DESENVOLV [BR], et al) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A] - AHMED A R H ET AL, "ISOLATION AND PARTIAL PURIFICATION OF A MELANOCYTE-STIMULATING HORMONE RECEPTOR FROM B16 MURINE MELANOMA CELLS A NOVEL APPROACH USING A CLEAVABLE BIOTINYLATED PHOTOACTIVATED LIGAND AND STREPTAVIDIN-COATED MAGNETIC BEADS", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (1992), vol. 286, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 377 - 382, XP001033867 [A] 1-8 * Experimental * | [A] - BIAGGI, MARCIA H. ET AL, "Melanotropic peptides-lipid bilayer interaction. Comparison of the hormone.alpha.-MSH to a biologically more potent analog", BIOPHYSICAL CHEMISTRY (1997), 67(1-3), 139-149, (1997), XP002283017 [A] 1-8 * Abstract, whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0301-4622(97)00030-6 | [T] - NAKAIE, C. R. ET AL, "Synthesis and pharmacological properties of TOAC-labeled angiotensin and bradykinin analogs", PEPTIDES (NEW YORK, NY, UNITED STATES) (2002), 23(1), 65-70, (2002), XP002282957 [T] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0196-9781(01)00580-0 | [T] - NAKAIE^A C R ET AL, "Comparative EPR and fluorescence conformational studies of fully active spin-labeled melanotropic peptides", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010525), vol. 497, no. 2-3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 103 - 107, XP004250048 [T] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(01)02449-8 | International search | [X] - BARBOSA ET AL., "First synthesis of a fully active spin-labeled peptide hormone", FEBS LETTERS, (199903), vol. 446, pages 45 - 48, XP002942689 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(99)00172-6 | [A] - MARCHETTO ET AL., "A novel spin-labeled amino acid derivative for use in peptide synthesis: (9-Fluroenylmethyloxycarbonyl)-2,2,6,6-tetramethylpiperidine-N-oxyl-4-amino-4-carboxylic acid", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, pages 11042 - 11043, XP002942688 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00076a093 |