EP1233871 - TYRE FOR VEHICLE WHEELS, PARTICULARLY FOR HEAVY DUTY VEHICLES SUCH AS LORRIES AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | [2006/34] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states PIRELLI PNEUMATICI Società per Azioni Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTIOL, Flavio Junior Rua Josè Lima de Filho, 195, Sao Bernardo do Campo 09812-330 Sao Paolo, SP / BR | 02 /
CAMPANA, Luigi Via Giordano Bruno, 4 20154 Milano / IT | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni, et al Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Direzione Proprietà Industriale Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni, et al Pirelli S.p.A. Direzione Proprietà Industriale Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00989921.2 | 30.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000EP11986 | Priority number, date | EP19990830749 | 01.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99830749 | US20000176812P | 19.01.2000 Original published format: US 176812 P | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0139993 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233871 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233871 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/04, B60C11/01, B60C11/13 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B60C11/04 (EP);
B60C11/01 (EP);
B60C11/042 (EP);
B60C2011/0383 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/35] | B60C11/04, B60C11/01, B60C11/13, // (B60C101/02, 105:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGRÄDERLUFTREIFEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR LKWKRAFTFAHRZEUG WIE Z.B. LASTFAHRZEUGE UND DERGLEICHEN | [2002/35] | English: | TYRE FOR VEHICLE WHEELS, PARTICULARLY FOR HEAVY DUTY VEHICLES SUCH AS LORRIES AND THE LIKE | [2002/35] | French: | PNEU POUR ROUES DE VEHICULES, EN PARTICULIER POUR VEHICULES LOURDS TELS QUE DES CAMIONS ET ANALOGUE | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 01.02.2006 | CY | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | LI | 01.02.2006 | DK | 01.05.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2007/50] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05338411 ; | [Y]US3841374 (BOILEAU J) [Y] 7 * column 4, line 44 - line 48 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US3858633 (BOILEAU JACQUES) [X] 1,3,4,6-13,15,17-19,21,25,26,28 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 3 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 7,20; | [X]US4550756 (HINKEL WALTER W [US]) [X] 1,4,8,10-12,15,18,19,23,26,27 * column 1, line 48 - column 3, line 42 * * figure - *; | [Y]EP0369932 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 20 * claim 13 ** figure 4 *; | [X]EP0578216 (MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]) [X] 1,16 * page 5, line 27 - page 7, line 8 * * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940325), vol. 018, no. 177, Database accession no. (M - 1582), & JP05338411 A 19931221 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [X] 1-6,8-13,15,17,18 * abstract * |