EP1159164 - RESTRAINING DEVICE FOR PEOPLE IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOHLLEBE, Thomas Dammwiese 12 38110 Braunschweig / DE | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/02] |
Former [2001/49] | Liebl, Thomas Neubauer - Liebl Patentanwälte Fauststrasse 30 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00989924.6 | 30.11.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000EP12006 | Priority number, date | DE19991058152 | 03.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19958152 | DE20001007404 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10007404 | DE20001007407 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10007407 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140029 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159164 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16, B60R21/04 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B60R21/203 (EP);
B60R21/045 (EP);
B60R21/05 (EP);
B60R21/205 (EP);
B60R2021/21525 (EP);
B60R2021/23169 (EP);
B60R21/206 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSONEN-RÜCKHALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2001/49] | English: | RESTRAINING DEVICE FOR PEOPLE IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2001/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE PERSONNES DANS UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US3853334 (AUMAN J ET AL) [DX] 1-3,25-28,30,32 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 17 *; | [X]US3764160 (FIALA E) [X] 1-5,21,22 * column 1, line 39 - line 49 * * column 2, line 8 - line 33 * * column 2, line 47 - line 61 *; | [DA]DE19545263 (TIETZ CONCEPT FA) [DA] 1,30 * the whole document *; | [PAD]DE19908637 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG) [PAD] 1,30 * the whole document * |