EP1240161 - THIENYLALANINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF CELL ADHESION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | |||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
For all designated states Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADEK, Thomas 2838 Chelsea Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 02 /
GOURVEST, Jean-François 12, rue de-la-Biberonne F-77410 Claye Souilly / FR | 03 /
PEYMAN, Anuschirwan Zeilsheimer Strasse 46 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 04 /
RUXER, Jean-Marie 12, Esplanade de la Manufacture F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | 05 /
SCHEUNEMANN, Karl-Heinz Im Kohlruss 25 65835 Liederbach / DE | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/38] | Rousseau, Pierrick Edouard, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Département des Brevets, 102, Route de Noisy 93235 Romainville Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00989987.3 | 12.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000EP12877 | Priority number, date | EP19990124971 | 15.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99124971 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0144237 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240161 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240161 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/12, A61K31/505, A61P19/08, A61P19/10 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THIENYLALANINDERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN DER ZELLADHÄSION | [2002/50] | English: | THIENYLALANINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF CELL ADHESION | [2002/38] | French: | DERIVES DE THIENYLALANINE INHIBITEURS D'ADHESION CELLULAIRE | [2002/38] |
Former [2002/38] | THIENYLALANINDERIVATIE ALS INHIBITOREN DER ZELLADHÄSION | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2007 | BE | 18.04.2007 | CH | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | IT | 18.04.2007 | LI | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | IE | 12.12.2007 | LU | 12.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
LU | 12.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 29.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0528587 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [DY] 1,6-9 * examples 2-5; claims 1,6,7 *; | [DY]WO9408577 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [DY] 1,6-9 * abstract * * page 70 - page 83; examples 7-10 *; | [DY]WO9532710 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [DY] 1,6-9 * abstract *; | [A]WO9721726 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR], et al) [A] 1,6-9* abstract *; | [DY]WO9937621 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL DE GMBH [DE], et al) [DY] 1,6-9 * page 33 - page 64; example -; claim 1 *; | [DY]EP0960882 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL DE GMBH [DE], et al) [DY] 1,6-9 * page 16 - page 36; example -; claims 17-12 * | Examination | EP0820991 |