EP1248630 - USE OF A DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING OLIGOSACCHARIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF SKIN DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/42] | COMPOSITION, IN PARTICULAR COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITION, CONTAINING OLIGOSACCHARIDES AND PREPARATION METHOD AND COSMETIC TREATMENT METHOD | ||
[2003/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratoires G Pharm 1469 Avenue des Orchidées 34980 St. Clément de Rivière / FR | [2002/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ, Gérard 1469 Avenue de Orchidées F-34980 St Clément de Rivière / FR | 02 /
FRANCISCO, Christian 5, rue Déodat de Severac F-66250 St Laurent de la Salanque / FR | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00990076.2 | 20.12.2000 | [2002/42] | WO2000FR03607 | Priority number, date | FR19990016060 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916060 | [2002/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145713 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1248630 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1248630 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/29] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1248630 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K7/48 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/702 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/008 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/197, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER OLIGOSACCHARIDE ENTHALTENDEN DERMATOLOGISCHEN ZUBEREITUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTERKRANKUNGEN | [2004/01] | English: | USE OF A DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING OLIGOSACCHARIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF SKIN DISEASES | [2004/01] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DERMATOLOGIQUE CONTENANT DES OLIGOSACCHARIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES MALADIES DE LA PEAU | [2004/01] |
Former [2002/42] | OLIGOSACCHARID ENTHALTENDE KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUBEREITUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND KOSMETISCHE BEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [2002/42] | COMPOSITION, IN PARTICULAR COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITION, CONTAINING OLIGOSACCHARIDES AND PREPARATION METHOD AND COSMETIC TREATMENT METHOD | ||
Former [2002/42] | COMPOSITION, NOTAMMENT COSMETIQUE OU DERMATOLOGIQUE, CONTENANT DES OLIGOSACCHARIDES, SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET UN PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT COSMETIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04075969.8 / EP1464330 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.07.2004 | TR | 14.07.2004 | [2009/42] |
Former [2007/09] | CY | 14.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0652012 (NAITO ALBERT [US]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * column 5, line 7 - line 25 * * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 13 ** claims 1,2 * |