EP1244667 - CYCLOHEXENE NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K.U. LEUVEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT Benedenstraat 59A Groot Begijnhof 3000 Leuven / BE | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states K.U. LEUVEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT Benedenstraat 59A Groot Begijnhof 3000 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jing Spoorweglaan 27 B-9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | 02 /
HERDEWIJN, Piet Olivierstraat 21 B-3111 Rotselaar / BE | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goen & Co, Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | ||
Former [2002/40] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00990110.9 | 27.12.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000IB02041 | Priority number, date | US19990173728P | 30.12.1999 Original published format: US 173728 P | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0149687 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1244667 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1244667 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/34, A61K31/70, C07H21/00 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D473/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CYCLOHEXENNUKLEINSÄUREN | [2002/40] | English: | CYCLOHEXENE NUCLEIC ACIDS | [2002/40] | French: | ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CONTENANT CYCLOHEXENE | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2006 | CY | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | TR | 05.04.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | LU | 27.12.2006 | IE | 28.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
LU | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 28.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
IE | 28.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
IE | 28.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5034506 (SUMMERTON JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]DE19815901 (AVENTIS RES & TECH GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A] - HERDEWIJN P, "Targeting RNA with Conformationally Restricted Oligonucleotides", LIEBIGS ANNALEN: ORGANIC AND BIOORGANIC CHEMISTRY, VCH PUBLISHERS, US, (19960901), no. 9, ISSN 0947-3440, pages 1337 - 1348, XP002094305 [A] * page 1345 - page 1347 * | [AD] - WANG J ET AL, "Enantioselective synthesis and conformational study of cyclohexene carbocyclic nucleosides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19991015), vol. 64, no. 21, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 7820 - 7827, XP002157746 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo9908288 | [PX] - HERDEWIJN, P. ET AL., "Cyclohexene nucleic acids (CeNA): Serum stable oligonucleotides that activate RNase H and increase duplex stability with complementary RNA", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 8595 - 8602, XP002179475 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja000018+ |