19.09.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
31.05.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.12.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2007 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
30.11.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
30.11.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
08.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.11.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
16.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
18.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.08.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] |
26.07.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
26.07.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
15.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|