Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003515755 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 | US0029214 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2723801 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 | US0029214 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1238298 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 | US0029214 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2392328 | 31.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 | US0029214 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6701053 | 02.03.2004 | B2 | US2002141719 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 | US70491900 | 02.11.2000 | US15220902 | 20.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6421491 | 16.07.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 | US70491900 | 02.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0138911 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100802251B | Global Dossier | 11.02.2008 | B1 | KR20020059769 | 13.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1391657 | 15.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US16695499 | 22.11.1999 | US18891500 | 13.03.2000 |