EP1238298 - DISPERSION SHIFTED LARGE EFFECTIVE AREA WAVEGUIDE FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yanming 3 Granger pond Way Lexingtons, MA 02420 / US | [2002/41] |
Former [2002/37] | 01 /
LIU, Yanming 41 Glendale Drive Horseheads, NY 14845 / US | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00990175.2 | 23.10.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000US29214 | Priority number, date | US19990166954P | 22.11.1999 Original published format: US 166954 P | US20000188915P | 13.03.2000 Original published format: US 188915 P | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138911 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1238298 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/02, G02B6/036 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/03666 (EP,US);
G02B6/028 (KR);
G02B6/02 (KR);
G02B6/02014 (EP,US);
G02B6/02019 (EP,US);
G02B6/02238 (EP,US);
G02B6/02266 (EP,US);
G02B6/02271 (EP,US);
G02B6/0281 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/37] | G02B6/16, G02B6/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DISPERSIONSVERSCHOBENE LICHTLEITFASER MIT GROSSER EFFEKTIVER FLÄCHE | [2002/37] | English: | DISPERSION SHIFTED LARGE EFFECTIVE AREA WAVEGUIDE FIBER | [2002/37] | French: | FIBRE GUIDE D'ONDES A DISPERSION DECALEE A GRANDE SURFACE EFFICACE | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 02.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/43] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5905838 (JUDY ARTHUR F [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,13-20,24-31 * column 6, line 15 - line 67 * * column 8, line 14 - line 51; figures 6,7 * [Y] 9,11,12,32-35; | [Y]WO9930194 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [Y] 9,12 * figures 7-9 *; | EP1037074 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figures 7-9 *; | [YD]US5748824 (SMITH DAVID K [US]) [YD] 11,12,32-35 * column 3, line 3 - line 39; figure 2 *; | [X]WO9800739 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 4 - page 5; figures 2,3 *; | [PX]EP1030199 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [PX] 1-9,12,24-31,34 * page 5, line 2 - page 7, line 19; figures 2-7 *; | [PX]WO0038356 (PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI SPA [IT], et al) [PX] 1-3,6-8,24 * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 27; figure 11 * | [X] - Y LIU ET AL, "Design and Fabrication of Locally Dispersion-Flattened Large Effective Area Fibers", PROCEEDINGS OF ECOC'98, 24TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, Madrid, Spain, (19980920), vol. 1, pages 37 - 38, XP002164954 [X] 1-8,13-20 * the whole document * |