EP1244687 - METHODS FOR PROTECTING AGAINST LETHAL INFECTION WITH i BACILLUS ANTHRACIS /i [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 1960 Kenny Road Columbus Ohio 43210-1063 / US | For all designated states Galloway, Darrell R. Dublin, OH / US | For all designated states Mateczun, Alfred J. Bethesda, MD / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, Ohio 43210-1063 / US | ||
For all designated states Galloway, Darrell R. Dublin, OH / US | |||
For all designated states Mateczun, Alfred J. Bethesda, MD / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLOWAY, Darrell, R. 5224 Brandonway Court Dublin, Ohio 43017 / US | 02 /
MATECZUN, Alfred, J. 2812 La Vega Dr. SW Alberquerque, New Mexico 87105 / US | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/47] | 01 /
GALLOWAY, Darrell, R. Dublin, OH / US | ||
02 /
MATECZUN, Alfred, J. 2812 La Vega Dr. SW Alberquerque, New Mexico 87105 / US | |||
Former [2002/40] | 01 /
GALLOWAY, Darrell, R. Dublin, OH / US | ||
02 /
MATECZUN, Alfred, J. Bethesda, MD / US | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00990284.2 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000US34912 | Priority number, date | US19990171459P | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 171459 P | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0145639 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1244687 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/07, C07K14/32 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/32 (EP,US);
A61K39/07 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/40] | C07H21/04, A61K48/00, A61K39/00, A61K39/07, A61K39/02, A61K39/385, C07K14/00, C07K16/00, C07K17/00, A01N63/00, C12N15/63 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZMA NAHMEN GEGEN DIE TÖDLICHE INFEKTION DURCH I BACILLUS ANTHRACIS | [2002/40] | English: | METHODS FOR PROTECTING AGAINST LETHAL INFECTION WITH i BACILLUS ANTHRACIS /i | [2002/40] | French: | PROCEDES DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'INFECTION LETALE PAR LE i BACILLUS ANTHRACIS /i | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/40] | PROC D S DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'INFECTION L TALE PAR LE i BACILLUS ANTHRACIS /i | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 19.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/19] | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/19] | Request for further processing for: | 19.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 19.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2003 | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2004 | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9219720 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]); | [X]US5677274 (LEPPLA STEPHEN H [US], et al); | [X]WO9950439 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US5591631 (LEPPLA STEPHEN H [US], et al); | [Y]US5677274 (LEPPLA STEPHEN H [US], et al); |