EP1243115 - METHOD FOR OPENING A PROPRIETARY MAC PROTOCOL IN A NON-DOCSIS MODEM COMPATIBLY WITH A DOCSIS MODEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013 Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013 Irvine, CA 92618-3616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIMB, John, O. 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92619-3616 / US | 02 /
SALA, Dolors 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92619-3616 / US | 03 /
GUMMALLA, Ajay, Chandra, V. 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92619-3616 / US | 04 /
BUNN, Fred 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92619-3616 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/18] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00990339.4 | 26.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US35197 | Priority number, date | US19990171912P | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 171912 P | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0147208 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243115 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243115 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04J3/16, H04L12/28 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H04L12/2801 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04W88/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÖFFNEN IN EINEM NICHT-DOCSIS MODEM EINES PROPRIETÄREN MAC-PROTOKOLLS KOMPATIBEL ZU DOCSIS MODEM | [2005/16] | English: | METHOD FOR OPENING A PROPRIETARY MAC PROTOCOL IN A NON-DOCSIS MODEM COMPATIBLY WITH A DOCSIS MODEM | [2002/39] | French: | PROCEDE DANS UN MODEM PERMETTANT D'OUVRIR COMPATIBLEMENT AVEC UN DOCSIS-MODEM UN PROTOCOLE PROPRIETAIRE MAC NON DOCSIS | [2005/16] |
Former [2002/39] | VERFAHREN ZUM ÖFFNEN VON PROPRIETÄREM MAC-PROTOKOLL IN NICHT-DOCSIS MODEM KOMPATIBEL ZU DOCSIS MODEM | ||
Former [2002/39] | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'OUVRIR UN PROTOCOLE PROPRIETAIRE MAC DANS UNE COMPATIBILITE DE MODEM NON DOCSIS AVEC UN MODEM DOCSIS | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2005 | BE | 26.10.2005 | CH | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | LI | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | TR | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.12.2005 | IE | 29.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | SE | 26.01.2006 | ES | 06.02.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
CY | 26.12.2005 | ||
IE | 29.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 29.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 29.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 29.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19805441 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,15,16 * column 3, line 15 - line 32; figures 4,5 * * column 3, line 51 - line 62 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 25 * * column 11, line 14 - line 22 * * column 11, line 31 - line 35 *; | [X]WO9930449 (COM21 INC [US]) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 1 * * page 6, line 3 - line 9 * * page 10, line 2 - line 7 * * page 14, line 29 - page 15, line 17 * * page 17, line 1 - line 5 *; | [A] - SMYTHE C, "NETWORKS AND THEIR ARCHITECTURES", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERING JOURNAL, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, LONDON, GB, (19910201), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 0954-0695, pages 18 - 28, XP000208834 [A] 1,8,15,20 * paragraph [0006]; figure 4 * |