EP1228315 - SCROLL COMPRESSOR FOR NATURAL GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1675 W. Campbell Road Sidney, OH 45365-0669 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states COPELAND CORPORATION 1675 W Campbell Road Sidney Ohio 45365-0669 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGNATIEV, Kirill M. 1425 Spruce Avenue Sidney, OH 45365 / US | 02 /
FOGT, James, F. 3345 Millcreek Road Sidney, OH 45365 / US | 03 /
FEATHERS, Kenneth, L. 3758 South Kessler Road West Milton, OH 45383 / US | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/51] | 01 /
IGNATIEV, Kirill M. 1425 Spruce Avenue Sidney, OH 45365 / US | ||
02 /
FOGT, James, F. 1116 Taft Street Sidney, OH 45365 / US | |||
03 /
FEATHERS, Kenneth, L. 3758 South Kessler Road West Milton, OH 45383 / US | |||
Former [2002/32] | 01 /
IGNATIEV, Kirill M. 1425 Spruce Avenue Sidney, OH 45365 / US | ||
02 /
FOGT, James, F. 2427 Aldrin Drive Sidney, OH 45365 / US | |||
03 /
FEATHERS, Kenneth, L. 3758 South Kessler Road West Milton, OH 45383 / US | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00990496.2 | 06.11.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000US41925 | Priority number, date | US19990435532 | 08.11.1999 Original published format: US 435532 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134979 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228315 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/00, F04C23/00, F04C29/02, F04C29/04 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
F04C29/04 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F04C29/023 (EP,US);
F04C29/026 (EP,US);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C2240/603 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/32] | F04B49/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIRALVERDICHTER FÜR ERDGAS | [2002/32] | English: | SCROLL COMPRESSOR FOR NATURAL GAS | [2002/32] | French: | COMPRESSEUR VOLUTE POUR GAZ NATUREL | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0822335 (COPELAND CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-7,10-14,17-20 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 23; figures 1,6,9 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 14 * * column 9, line 9 - column 9, line 39 * [Y] 2,8,9,15,16; | [Y]US5359247 (BALDWIN JEFFREY D [US], et al) [Y] 2,15,16 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 13; figures 3-7 *; | [Y]JPH10184568 ; | [A]US4928503 (RIFFE DELMAR R [US]) [A] 8,9 * column 6, line 28 - column 6, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP01032089 ; | [A]US4676075 (SHIIBAYASHI MASAO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 11 - column 4, line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]US5217360 (KAWAHARA SADAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10184568 A 19980714 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890518), vol. 013, no. 214, Database accession no. (M - 827), & JP01032089 A 19890202 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | International search | [XP]US6017205 (WEATHERSTON ROGER C [US], et al); | [Y]US4780061 (BUTTERWORTH ARTHUR L [US]) |