EP1228302 - CONTROL METHOD FOR STARTING A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive S.A.S. 1 avenue Paul Ourliac, B.P. 1149 31036 Toulouse Cédex 01 / FR | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive S.A.S. 1 avenue Paul Ourliac, B.P. 1149 31036 Toulouse Cédex 01 / FR | ||
For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | |||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive S.A.S. 1 avenue Paul Ourliac, B.P. 1149 31036 Toulouse cedex 01 / FR | ||
For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | |||
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive S.A.S. 1 avenue Paul Ourliac, B.P. 1149 31036 Toulouse cedex 01 / FR | ||
For all designated states Renault S.A. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUBOURG, Alain 7, rue Jean-Baptiste Dantil F-31240 Saint Jean / FR | 02 /
HAUET, Bertrand 19, rue de l'Yveline F-78640 St. Germain de la Grange / FR | 03 /
TARROUX, Francis La Nadale F-31320 Aureville / FR | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/32] | 01 /
AUBOURG, Alain 7, rue Jean-Baptiste Dantil F-31240 Saint Jean / FR | ||
02 /
HAUET, Bertrand 19, rue de l'Yveline F-78640 St. Germain de la Grange / FR | |||
03 /
TARROUX, Francis 45, rue Francis Pons F-31120 Pinsaguel / FR | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/32] | Berg, Peter Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00990598.5 | 08.11.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000EP11043 | Priority number, date | FR19990014146 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9914146 | [2002/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134961 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228302 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228302 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
F02D41/06 (KR);
F02D41/062 (EP,US);
F02D41/064 (EP,US);
F02D41/065 (EP,US);
F02D41/3029 (EP,US);
F02D41/3076 (EP,US);
F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
F02D2041/389 (EP,US);
F02D2250/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2004/36] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DES STARTS EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT DIREKTEINSPRITZUNG | [2002/32] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR STARTING A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2002/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DU DEMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET A INJECTION DIRECTE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 01.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19539885 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 1 * * column 5, line 49 - line 51 * * column 12, line 54 - column 13, line 63 *; | [A]EP0919710 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 34 - line 40 * * column 3, line 34 * * column 4, line 37 - line 48 *; | [A]EP0849455 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 2 * * column 5, line 18 - line 24 * * column 6, line 55 - line 58 * * column 8, line 48 - line 52 *; | [A]GB2315297 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column A * * page 1, line 6 - line 11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4020298 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * column 5, line 19 - line 29 * * column A *; | [A]US5809973 (IIDA KAZUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 4 * column 1, line 10 - line 12 * * column 1, line 24 - line 30 * * column 1, line 42 - line 43 * |