EP1238097 - DIETHOXYFLUORESCEIN AS INDICATOR FOR CYTOCHROME P450 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | |||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham plc 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAMBAL, Ramesh, GlaxoSmithKline Pharmaceuticals 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
BLOOMER, Jacqueline, Carol GlaxoSmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals The Frythe Welwyn, Herfordshire AL6 9AR / GB | [2006/33] |
Former [2002/37] | 01 /
BAMBAL, Ramesh, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | ||
02 /
BLOOMER, Jacqueline, Carol GlaxoSmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals The Frythe Welwyn, Herfordshire AL6 9AR / GB | Representative(s) | Thornley, Rachel Mary GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Thornley, Rachel Mary GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00990692.6 | 08.12.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000EP12450 | Priority number, date | US19990170405P | 13.12.1999 Original published format: US 170405 P | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0144495 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238097 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238097 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1238097 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/26 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
C12Q1/26 (EP);
C12Q2326/00 (EP);
C12Q2326/40 (EP);
G01N2333/795 (EP);
G01N2333/80 (EP);
G01N2333/90245 (EP);
G01N2500/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIETHOXYFLUORESCEIN ALS INDIKATOR FÜR CYTOCHROME P450 | [2006/33] | English: | DIETHOXYFLUORESCEIN AS INDICATOR FOR CYTOCHROME P450 | [2002/37] | French: | DIETHOXYFLUORESCEIN EN TANT QU'INDICATEUR POUR CYTOCHROME P450 | [2002/37] |
Former [2002/37] | DIETHOXYFLUORESCEIN ALS INDIKATOR FÜR CYTCHROME P450 | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 08.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | IE | 08.12.2006 | LU | 08.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
TR | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.12.2006 | ||
LU | 08.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [E]WO0114361 (GENTEST CORP [US]) [E] 1-8* page 3, line 18 - line 21 *; | [X] - MILLER A D, "Flow cytometric techniques for measurement of cytochrome P-450 activity in viable cells.", METHODS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (1990) 33 71-9., XP001016404 [X] 1-8 * figure 1 * * page 77 - page 79 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-679X(08)60512-9 | [X] - WHITE I N H ET AL, "CHARACTERISTICS OF RAT HEPATOCYTES SORTED BY FLUORESCENCE-ACTIVATED FLOW CYTOMETRY EFFECTS OF MIXED FUNCTION OXIDASE INDUCERS", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 38, no. 10, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 1639 - 1646, XP001015256 [X] 1-8 * page 1640, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1161, column L, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(89)90312-2 | [X] - WHITE I N H ET AL, "FLUORESCENCE-ACTIVATED SORTING OF RAT HEPATOCYTES BASED ON THEIR MIXED FUNCTION OXIDASE ACTIVITIES TOWARDS DIETHOXYFLUORESCEIN", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1987), vol. 247, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 23 - 28, XP001014797 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * |