EP1245062 - NETWORK STRUCTURE USING HIGH DISPERSION VOLUME HOLOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25 rue Leblanc Bâtiment Le Ponant D 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states THALES AVIONICS S.A. Aérodrome de Villacoublay 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORBIEU, Bertrand, Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellect. 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 02 /
LABORIE, Jean-Jacques, Thomson-CSF Propriété Intel. 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2007/32] |
Former [2002/40] | 01 /
MORBIEU, Bertrand Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellect. 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
LABORIE, Jean-Jacques Thomson-CSF Propriété Intel. 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/29] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/40] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al THALES Intellectual Property, 13, avenue du Président S. Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00990838.5 | 28.12.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000FR03726 | Priority number, date | FR19990016777 | 30.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916777 | [2002/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0150554 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1245062 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1245062 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/00, G02B5/18, G02B5/32 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
G02B5/32 (EP,US);
G03H1/0248 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2231 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2234 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Title | German: | HOLOGRAPHISCHE VOLUMEN-GITTERSTRUKTUR MIT HOHER DISPERSION | [2002/40] | English: | NETWORK STRUCTURE USING HIGH DISPERSION VOLUME HOLOGRAPHY | [2002/40] | French: | STRUCTURE DE RESEAU PAR HOLOGRAPHIE DE VOLUME A FORTE DISPERSION | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 23.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.12.2007 | CY | 26.12.2007 | DK | 26.12.2007 | FI | 26.12.2007 | NL | 26.12.2007 | TR | 26.12.2007 | IE | 28.12.2007 | LU | 28.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | CH | 31.12.2007 | FR | 31.12.2007 | IT | 31.12.2007 | LI | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | SE | 26.03.2008 | GR | 27.03.2008 | ES | 06.04.2008 | PT | 26.05.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/42] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
CY | 26.12.2007 | ||
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
TR | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 28.12.2007 | ||
LU | 28.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
CY | 26.12.2007 | ||
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 28.12.2007 | ||
LU | 28.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
CY | 26.12.2007 | ||
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 28.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 28.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 28.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 28.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
ES | 06.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | FI | 26.12.2007 | |
NL | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 26.12.2007 | |
SE | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | SE | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4834474 (GEORGE NICHOLAS [US], et al) [A] 1,10,14,15 * column 8, line 47 - column 9, line 13; figures 13B,16A,16B *; | [A] - LOISEAUX B ET AL, "Phase volume holographic grating for high energy lasers", SOLID STATE LASERS FOR APPLICATION TO INERTIAL CONFINEMENT FUSION: SECOND ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, PARIS, FRANCE, 22-25 OCT. 1996, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1997, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 3047, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 957 - 962, XP000912143 [A] 1,10,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.235936 | [A] - JUNE-KOO RHEE ET AL, "CHIRPED-PULSE AMPLIFICATION OF 85-FS PULSES AT 250 KHZ WITH THIRD-ORDER DISPERSION COMPENSATION BY USE OF HOLOGRAPHIC TRANSMISSION GRATINGS", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, (19941001), vol. 19, no. 19, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1550 - 1552, XP000466527 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - TSUNG-YUAN YANG ET AL, "Femtosecond laser pulse compression using volume phase transmission holograms", APPLIED OPTICS, 1 JULY 1985, USA, vol. 24, no. 13, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 2021 - 2023, XP002145940 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.24.002021 | [A] - LOISEAUX B ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF PERPENDICULAR CHIRPED PHASE VOLUME GRATING PAIRS FOR LASER PULSE STRETCHING", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, (19960601), vol. 21, no. 11, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 806 - 808, XP000594889 [A] 1 * the whole document * |