Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
23.08.2002 | Change - representative | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] |
19.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
16.08.2002 | Change - request for examination | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
16.08.2002 | Change - representative | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
14.08.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid | |
14.08.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee | |
09.08.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
09.08.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
29.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.02.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.09.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.08.2001 | Change - extension states | |
28.06.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.06.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.03.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication |